Dogfen lywodraethu LALEHAM RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH MARCH 1971, AS AMENDED 1 JULY 2003, AS AMENDED ON 01 MAY 1987 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2017 as amended on 24 May 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, WITHIN LALEHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITH THE FOLLOWING OBJECTIVES: A. TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND IMPROVE AND TO STIMULATE INTEREST IN THE AMENITY, BEAUTY, CHARACTER AND COMMUNITY OF LALEHAM, INCLUDING FEATURES OF HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL, LANDSCAPE AND PUBLIC INTEREST. B. TO OPTIMISE AND ENHANCE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS OF INDIVIDUALS WITHIN THAT LOCAL COMMUNITY. C. TO MAINTAIN THE AWARENESS OF RESIDENTS TO LOCAL EVENTS AND TO MATTERS OF LOCAL INTEREST OR CONCERN.
Maes buddion
LALEHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.