Dogfen lywodraethu THE COSTUME SOCIETY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MARCH 1973, AS AMENDED 10 APRIL 1988, 15 SEPTEMBER 1990, 30 MARCH 1997, 24 JUNE 2000 AND 3 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 02 JUL 2017 as amended on 04 May 2024 as amended on 06 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Objects of the Charity are to promote, for the benefit of the public, the education, exploration and appreciation of clothing, textiles in dress, accessories and material culture throughout the ages and from different cultures, ethnicities, and identities; and to encourage the creation, preservation and accessibility of historic and contemporary garments and relevant source material.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.