Dogfen lywodraethu COMMUNITY & VOLUNTARY ACTION TORBAY (CVA TORBAY)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST APRIL 1971 AS AMENDED 27TH MARCH 1974, 18TH APRIL 1977 AND 15TH JUNE 1982, 24 MARCH 1999 AND 6 APRIL 2005 AND 01 APRIL 2009 AND 04 MAY 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF TORBAY AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID PURPOSES BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE SAME AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
TORBAY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.