Dogfen lywodraethu THE ASHFORD HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE
Rhif yr elusen: 263108

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 670 diwrnod
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/09/1971 AS AMENDED ON 05/01/1972 AS AMENDED ON 24/10/1972 AS AMENDED ON 28/10/1988 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 13/10/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR PATIENTS IN HOSPITALS, SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS AND THOSE BEING CARED FOR IN THE COMMUNITY, IN THE ASHFORD BOROUGH
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
ASHFORD AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.