Dogfen lywodraethu ORAL HEALTH FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/10/1971 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/10/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/02/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/12/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE FOUNDATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO IMPROVE THE ORAL HEALTH OF THE COMMUNITY IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND IN PARTICULAR TO EDUCATE THE COMMUNITY IN THE BENEFITS OF ACHIEVING AND MAINTAINING A HIGH STANDARD OF ORAL HEALTH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.