THE COMPASSIONATE FRIENDS
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Nid oes gwybodaeth ar gael am weithgareddau'r elusen.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
Llywodraethu
- 17 Mawrth 2004: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1082335 THE COMPASSIONATE FRIENDS
- 18 Ionawr 1972: Cofrestrwyd
- 17 Mawrth 2004: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
- TCF (Enw gwaith)
- THE SOCIETY OF THE COMPASSIONATE FRIENDS (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 24TH OCTOBER 1971 AS AMENDED 30TH JUNE 1973,18TH MAY 1974, 18TH JUNE 1988,15TH JULY 1995, 12TH SEPTEMBER 1998.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO (A) ADVANCE AND ASSIST THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL ILLNESS,SUFFERING AND INFIRMITY AMONG(1) PARENTS OCCASIONED BY THE DEATH OF THEIR CHILD OR CHILDREN(2) OTHER CLOSE RELATIVES OF THE CHILD CONCERNED,NORMALLY BROTHERS, SISTERS AND GRANDPARENTS(B)PROMOTE AND SUPPORT RESEARCH AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH INTO MEDICINE AND ROAD SAFETY AND OTHER CHILD LIFE PROTECTION PROJECTS LIKELY TO EFFECTIVELY REDUCE DEATHS AMONG CHILDREN. (C)PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL, ADVISORY AND OTHER RELATED SERVICES DESIGNED TO INCREASE AWARENESS AND SUPPORT FOR VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS SUPPORTING THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS OCCASIONED BY THE DEATH OF THEIR CHILD OR CHILDREN.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.