Dogfen lywodraethu THE CHIPSTEAD PLAYERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD MAY 1974, WITH AMENDMENT OF 29TH MAY 1975 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17 JUL 2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 JUN 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 JUN 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART.(FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE RULES).
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED - NORMALLY LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.