Dogfen lywodraethu TAXI CHARITY FOR MILITARY VETERANS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 27/02/1948 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/1956 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/1972 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07/03/2007 ADOPTED 12/03/2007 AS AMENDED ON 09/02/2015 AS AMENDED ON 09/03/2015 as amended on 09 Nov 2020 as amended on 08 Feb 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ORGANISE OUTINGS, ENTERTAINMENT, TRANSPORT AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR FORMER SERVICEMEN AND WOMEN WHO ARE DISABLED, ELDERLY, INFIRM, IMPOVERISHED OR OTHERWISE IN NEED OF CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE. (B) TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF FORMER SERVICEMEN AN WOMEN WHO ARE DISABLED, ELDERLY, INFIRM, IMPOVERISHED OR OTHERWISE IN NEED OF CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.