Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH WHEEL OF YOGA
Rhif yr elusen: 264993
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1972 AMENDED 25TH AUGUST 1973, 7TH APRIL 1979, 9TH APRIL 1983, 14TH APRIL 1985, AND 12TH APRIL 1987. AS AMENDED 13 SEPTEMBER 1997
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A. TO ENCOURAGE AND HELP ALL PERSONS TO A GREATER KNOWLEDG AND UNDERSTANDING OF ALL ASPECTS OF RESEARCH, STUDY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING. B. TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF TEACHING. C. TO CO-OPERATE WITH AND SUPPORT OTHER ORGANISATIONS HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.