Dogfen lywodraethu ARCHITECTS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 DEC 1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 NOV 1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 JUN 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 SEP 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JUN 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JUN 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 JUN 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 JUN 2015 as amended on 16 Jun 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS ENGAGED OR FORMERLY ENGAGED IN THE PRACTICE OF ARCHITECTURE AND THE SPOUSES, CIVIL PARTNERS, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, SURVIVING CIVIL PARTNERS, CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS BEING IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.