Dogfen lywodraethu The British Society of Periodontology and Implant Dentistry

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/04/1974 AS AMENDED ON 05/05/1982 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/1986 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/1999 AS AMENDED ON 03/06/2015 as amended on 24 Apr 2019 as amended on 24 Apr 2019 as amended on 15 Jun 2020 as amended on 15 Jun 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE FOR THE GENERAL HEALTH, WELLBEING AND KNOWLEDGE OF HE PUBLIC, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF DENTISTRY AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF PERIODONTOLOGY AND DENTAL IMPLANTOLOGY AND IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF TO ADVANCE ALL ASPECTS OF PERIODONTOLOGY AND DENTAL IMPLANTOLOGY AND TO PROMOTE IMPROVEMENTS IN THE TEACHING OF THE SAME
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.