Dogfen lywodraethu THE ASSOCIATION OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED TEACHERS AND STUDENTS
Rhif yr elusen: 266056
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APRIL 1973 AS AMENDED APRIL 1983, 31 MARCH 1985, 2 APRIL 1989, 9 AUGUST 1998, 2 SEPTEMBER 2001, 7 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 8 MAY 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED TEACHERS AND STUDENTS, WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THEIR WORK IN EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
UNITED KINGDOM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.