Dogfen lywodraethu SALISBURY MUSICAL SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 266461

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 9TH OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 1980, 12 OCTOBER 1999 AND 2 OCTOBER 2007 as amended on 26 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS ITS COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
SALISBURY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.