Dogfen lywodraethu VOLUNTARY SERVICE ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/08/1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/1984 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/06/2012 as amended on 12 Nov 2020 as amended on 03 Dec 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To advance such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) in and around the London borough of Lewisham, principally through voluntary action or by other means, or in the pursuit of objects that improve the living conditions, health and wellbeing of people in need.
Maes buddion
FOREST HILL AND SYDENHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.