Dogfen lywodraethu THE DAVID HOUSE FELLOWSHIP

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12/02/1974 AS AMENDED ON 20/01/1977 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/1981 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS EXPRESSED IN THE BIBLE, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG JEWS.
Maes buddion
UK AND THE REST OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.