HOVE ST ANDREW (OLD CHURCH) HOVE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in school. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2008
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Brighton And Hove
- Dwyrain Sussex
Llywodraethu
- 03 Hydref 1974: Cofrestrwyd
- 13 Hydref 2010: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- ST ANDREW (OLD CHURCH) HOVE (Enw gwaith)
- HOVE ST ANDREW'S CHURCHYARD FUNDS (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £75.86k | £85.30k | £98.91k | £108.62k | £90.77k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £110.58k | £128.95k | £95.72k | £119.57k | £108.59k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2009 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2009 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | 15 Hydref 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | 19 Mai 2009 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2007 | 16 Hydref 2008 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2007 | 02 Medi 2008 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2006 | 27 Medi 2007 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2006 | 27 Rhagfyr 2007 | 57 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2005 | 30 Awst 2006 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2005 | 30 Awst 2006 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
HOVE CORPORATION ACT 1966 AS AMENDED 11TH MAY 1972
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE ERECTION THE SPECIFIED LANDS OF A PARISH HALL. (B) THE REMOVAL BY THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF HUMAN REMAINS. (C) THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH AND OF SO MUCH OF THE CHURCHYARD AS DOES NOT FORM PART OF THE SPECIFIED LANDS. (D) THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE BENEFICE INCOME OF THE BENEFICE WHICH MAY BE BY WAY OF PAYMENT TO THE CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND. (E) THE PURCHASE, DEVELOPMENT, IMPROVEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF LAND AND BUILDINGS HELD OR USED OR TO BE HELD OR USED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE PARISH. (F) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE PARISH.
Maes buddion
PARISH OF ST ANDREW, HOVE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window