Dogfen lywodraethu LEEDS CASTLE FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MAY 1974 AS AMENDED 25 & 26 NOVEMBER 1975, 12 JANUARY 1976, 14 DECEMBER 1977, 9 & 18 JANUARY 1978, 3 DECEMBER 1984 AND 5 FEBRUARY 1990
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION TO RELIEVE POVERTY TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND TO PROMOTE AND AID SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW TO BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PRESERVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE WHOLE OR PARTS OF THE BUILDINGS AND THEIR GROUNDS KNOWN AS LEEDS CASTLE IN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE MEDICAL RESEARCH, AND TO ENCOURAGE RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN ANY BRANCH OF THE ARTS AND SCIENCES (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION
Maes buddion
THE COUNTY OF KENT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.