Dogfen lywodraethu NEW VENTURE PRODUCTIONS
Rhif yr elusen: 268607

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/10/1973 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 02/11/2011 as amended on 21 Oct 2017 as amended on 18 Nov 2020 as amended on 18 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN SAID ARTS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.