Dogfen lywodraethu HOSPITAL RADIO BEDFORD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD APRIL 1975 AMENDED 24.2.78, 30.9.93, AS AMENDED ON 29TH FEBRUARY 2004 AND 2 APRIL 2008 AS AMENDED ON 16 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 11 APR 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2.1 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH AND OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN BEDFORD BOROUGH BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, RESIDENTIAL HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS AND FOR PATIENTS RECEIVING COMMUNITY CARE; AND 2.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE BENEFIT OF LIVING A HEALTHY LIFESTYLE AND THE IMPORTANCE OF MAINTAINING GOOD PERSONAL MENTAL HEALTH BY (MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE MEANS OF BROADCASTING HEALTH EDUCATION MESSAGES TO PEOPLE LIVING IN BEDFORD BOROUGH.
Maes buddion
BEDFORD BOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.