Dogfen lywodraethu DOVER LIFE GUARD CLUB

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 AUGUST 1975 AS AMENDED 18 MAY 1981, 7 DECEMBER 1981, 3 DECEMBER 1984, 2ND DECEMBER 1985 AND 8 DECEMBER 1986 AND 8 APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED 2 DECEMBER 1991
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PRESERVATION OF HUMAN LIFE FOR THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF SWIMMING ANDLIFE SAVING AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT, BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE, TO TEACH, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE SWIMMING AND DIVING GENERALLY AND PARTICULARLY THOSE ARTS NECESSARY IN LIFE SAVING. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION).
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.