Dogfen lywodraethu THE SEVENTY4 FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 SEPTEMBER 1975 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 2 DECEMBER 1985, 4 NOVEMBER 1992 AND 7 MAY 2009 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME OF 5 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 27 AUGUST 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY SUBSTANCE MISUSE AND OTHER ADDICTIVE DISORDERS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, ADVICE, COUNSELLING, TREATMENT AND REHABILITATION SERVICES TO SUCH PERSONS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.