Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH KIDNEY PATIENT ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/09/1975 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/04/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/04/1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/05/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/05/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/06/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 DEC 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO EDUCATE AND INFORM THE PUBLIC REGARDING ALL FORMS OF KIDNEY AND ASSOCIATED DISORDERS. (B) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM KIDNEY AND RENAL DISEASES OR ASSOCIATED DISORDERS ("KIDNEY PATIENTS") INCLUDING PROVIDING THEM WITH FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (C) TO MAKE GRANTS TO HOSPITALS FOR NEW BUILDINGS AND OTHER CONSTRUCTION WORKS FOR KIDNEY UNITS, FOR FACILITIES FOR KIDNEY TRANSPLANTATION, DIALYSIS AND ANY OTHER RENAL TREATMENT, AND TO MEET THE COST OF EMPLOYING PERSONNEL TO PROVIDE RENAL SERVICES. (D) TO FUND RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF KIDNEY PATIENTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.