Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF TOY AND LEISURE LIBRARIES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 AUGUST 1975 AND AMENDED 6 JULY 1978 AND 1 JULY 1983 AS AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 1994 AND 9 OCTOBER 2007 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 NOVEMBER 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF 1. ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, INCLUDING DISABLED CHILDREN, THOSE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND THOSE LIVING IN DISADVANTAGED CIRCUMSTANCES. 2. DISABLED ADULTS, INCLUDING THOSE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES. 3. THE FAMILIES OF SUCH CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WHO WOULD BENEFIT FROM THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY TOY AND LEISURE LIBRARIES IN THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC, EDUCATIONAL AND STIMULATING TOYS AND EQUIPMENT, AND PLAY AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.