Dogfen lywodraethu WOODSPRING ASSOCIATION FOR BLIND PEOPLE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/03/1975 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/1984 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/1997 AS AMENDED ON 08/09/1998 AS AMENDED ON 15/08/2002 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2002 AS AMENDED ON 04/04/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE PREVENTION AND ALLEVIATION OF BLINDNESS AND IMPAIRED VISION 2. THE COLLABORATION WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR ANY ORGANISATION BODY, TRUST OR FUND OR ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHICH IN ANY WAY ADVANCE THE WELFARE OF ANYONE HAVING VISUAL IMPAIRMENT 3. THE INVESTIGATION OF NECESSITOUS CASES WITH A VIEW TO RENDERING ASSISTANCE 4. THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES AS MAY BE DEEMED DESIRABLE AND NECESSARY BY THE COMMITTEE 5. THE RENDERING OF ASSISTANCE TO BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS
Maes buddion
WOODSPRING
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.