Dogfen lywodraethu ALLEYNE'S SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEMES OF 5TH JANUARY 1911, 5TH NOVEMBER 1921, 9TH OCTOBER 1950, 27TH JANUARY 1954, 7TH MARCH 1972 AND 6TH SEPTEMBER 1977, 6TH SEPTEMBER 1977 AND 11TH JULY 1989
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAIND THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE IN ATTENDANCE AT THE THOMAS ALLEYNE SCHOOL, OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THE TWO YEARS AT ANY TIME BEEN, IN ATTENDANCE AT THE THOMAS ALLEYNE SCHOOL OR ALLEYNE'S SCHOOL OR HAVE BEEN IN ATTENDANCE AT AY TIME FOR NOT LESS THAN ONE YEAR AT THE THOMAS ALLEYNE SCHOOL AND FOR NOT LESS THAN ONE YEAR AT EITHER ALLEYNE'S SCHOOL OR STEVENAGE GIRLS SCHOOL, AND WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE GOVERNORS, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.