Dogfen lywodraethu THE LAKE DISTRICT CALVERT TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/01/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/1982 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/10/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/1993 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/10/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF SPECIALISED FACILITIES WITHIN THE LAKE DISTRICT NATIONAL PARK; (B) EDUCATING AND SUPPLYING INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO OTHER PROVIDERS OF OUTDOOR PURSUITS AND ACTIVITIES IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THOSE PROVIDERS OWN SERVICE TO PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES ; AND/OR (C) PROVIDING AND FACILITATING OUTDOOR PURSUITS ACTIVITIES TO PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES (WHETHER IN THE LAKE DISTRICT NATIONAL PARK OR ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS IN LIFE FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITY AND AIMING TO ENSURE THAT DISABLED PEOPLE CAN BENEFIT FROM OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES IN THE SAME OR SUBSTANTIALLY THE SAME WAY AS ABLE BODIED PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.