Dogfen lywodraethu Friends of Origin Housing
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 14 APRIL 1976 AND AMENDED ON 17 MARCH 1999 , 17 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 8 DECEMBER 2004 as amended on 01 Feb 2021 as amended on 01 Mar 2021 as amended on 06 May 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To assist the charitable works of Origin Housing, previously known as St Pancras and Humanist Housing Association ("the Association"), and any subsidiaries of the Association as long as its objectives remain charitable and to support projects for the benefit of local communities in the areas that Origin Housing operates and to assist any other charity or charities in such manner being charitable and to such extent as the trustees shall decide.
Maes buddion
CENTRAL LONDON NORTH OF THE THAMES, NORTH LONDON AND HERTFORDSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.