Dogfen lywodraethu THE RIFLES WARDROBE AND MUSEUM TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 28/06/1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/03/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE ADMINISTRATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE PROPERTY BELONGING TO THE CHARITY AND KNOWN AS THE WARDROBE, AT SALISBURY, IN THE COUNTY OF WILTSHIRE AND (2) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PUBLIC MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC, OF DOCUMENTS, ARTIFACTS, AND OTHER ITEMS CONNECTED WITH THE FORMER REGIMENTS (THE REGIMENTAL COLLECTION) SO AS TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE FORMER REGIMENTS IN THE HISTORY OF THE FORMER REGIMENTS AND TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.