Dogfen lywodraethu THE DARTINGTON INTERNATIONAL SUMMER SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JUN 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 OCT 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUL 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUN 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JAN 1991 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 MAR 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE SCHEMES TO PROVIDE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF MUSIC AND RELATED ARTS INCLUDING OPERA,MUSIC THEATRE,ELECTRONIC MEDIA,MUSIC AND DANCE AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE THE DARTINGTON INTERNATIONAL SUMMER SCHOOL AND ITS SUCCESSOR BY WHATEVER NAME IT MAY BE KNOWN.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.