Dogfen lywodraethu THE SISTERS OF THE INFANT JESUS (NICOLAS BARRE) GENERAL TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 MARCH 1975 VARIED BY DEEDS DATED 14 MAY 1981, 4 MARCH 1982, 5 FEBRUARY 1993, 9 MARCH 1993 AND 26 JUNE 1998
Gwrthrychau elusennol
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON IN ENGLAND AND WALES OR ELSEWHERE, BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OR WITH THE SUPPORT OF THE SOCIETY AS THE TRUSTEES, WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PROVINCIAL SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF DEED)
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.