Dogfen lywodraethu THE ENERGY, PETROLEUM, MINERAL AND NATURAL RESOURCES LAW AND POLICY EDUCATION TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 272715

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH DECEMBER 1976 AND DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 6TH APRIL 1983, 10TH MAY 1985, 23RD DECEMBER 1998 AND 12 SEPTEMBER 2002, AMENDED 4TH NOVEMBER 2011 AS AMENDED ON 02 NOV 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF EDUCATION IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO ENERGY, PETROLEUM, MINERAL AND NATURAL RESOURCES LAW AND POLICY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.