Dogfen lywodraethu RAJPUT SAMAJ OF UK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION REVISED 31ST JULY 1977 AND AMENDED 22ND APRIL 1979 AND 21 OCTOBER 1990, 19 APRIL 1998, 11TH APRIL 1999, 28 APRIL 2002, 27 APRIL 2003, 20 FEBRUARY 2005 AND 17 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED 01/9/13 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAR 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL, CULTURAL, EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR THE WELFARE OF ALL MEMBERS IRRESPECTIVE OF CREED & SEXUAL ORIENTATION, MAINTAINING THE RAJPUT TRADITIONS AND VALUES. TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE CAUSES WHICH THE MEMBERS MAY SEE FIT TO PROMOTE IN RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND FOR SPECIFIC CAUSES ABROAD. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES WHEN POSSIBLE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES, TAKING ACCOUNT OF THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN, YOUTH, ELDERS AND DISABLED IN THE RSUK.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.