Dogfen lywodraethu REHABILITATION SERVICES TRUST FOR OXFORDSHIRE RE-EMPLOYMENT LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/08/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 OCT 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 DEC 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISTRESS AND DISORDER INCLUDING PERSONS IN OXFORDSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: 2.1 .1 TO PROVIDE FOR THE REHABILITATION OF THE DISABLED; 2.1.2 TO PROVIDE THEM WITH OPPORTUNITIES FOR THERAPEUTIC WORK, TRAINING, WORK PLACEMENT AND SUPPORT TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT.
Maes buddion
OXFORD AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.