Dogfen lywodraethu INTERNATIONAL GLAUCOMA ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/01/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/02/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/03/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/03/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2015 as amended on 20 Jun 2024 as amended on 20 Jun 2024 as amended on 20 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the charity are, for the public benefit, to: help preserve the sight of people affected by glaucoma and allied conditions; advance education and research into the causes, diagnosis, care and treatment of glaucoma and allied conditions; raise awareness and understanding of glaucoma; and provide advice and support to people living with glaucoma and the professionals who support them.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.