Dogfen lywodraethu THE CLINICAL GENETICS SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 17/09/1976 AS AMENDED ON 22/04/1977 AS AMENDED ON 25/11/1977 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 14/03/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE SCIENCE AND MEDICAL PRACTICE OF CLINICAL GENETICS. FOR THIS PURPOSE ONLY IT WILL BRING TOGETHER PERSONS WHO HAVE A COMMON INTEREST IN CLINICAL GENETICS, SO THAT THEY MAY BE AIDED IN THEIR JOINT ENDEAVOURS TO DIAGNOSE, UNDERSTAND, PREVENT, ALLEVIATE AND CURE CONGENITAL MALFORMATIONS AND CONDITIONS WITH A GENETIC AETIOLOGY. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE AIMS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE SOCIETY MAY PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE REPORTS, STATEMENTS, AND RESEARCH FINDINGS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.