Dogfen lywodraethu THE ASSOCIATION FOR LATIN TEACHING
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 29 JULY 1976 AS AMENDED 18 NOVEMBER 1978, 25 JULY 1986, 31 JULY 1987, 28 JULY 1994, 17 AUGUST 1995 AND 29 JULY 2004.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE EFFECTIVE TEACHING IN THE FIRST PLACE OF LATIN LANGUAGE AND LITERATURE, AND IN THE SECOND PLACE OF CLASSICAL GREEK LANGUAGE AND LITERATURE, ANCIENT HISTORY, AND CLASSICAL STUDIES IN GENERAL IN THE SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL SERVE TEACHERS OF THESE SUBJECTS BY MEANS OF COURSES, EITHER RESIDENTIAL OR NON-RESIDENTIAL, PUBLICATIONS, AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.