Dogfen lywodraethu MAN GROUP PLC CHARITABLE TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 275386

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JAN 1978 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 09 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 28 JUN 2006 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05 JUL 2016 as amended on 17 May 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.