Dogfen lywodraethu THE AMERSHAM SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 OCTOBER 1978 AS AMENDED 22 OCTOBER 1980, 28 OCTOBER 1998 AND 25 OCTOBER 2000 as amended on 29 Oct 2014 as amended on 27 Oct 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE CHARACTER AND AMENITIES OF THE OLD TOWN OF AMERSHAM.(B)TO PROMOTE STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE, CONSERVATION, PLANNING, DESIGN, MAINTENANCE AND USE OF BUILDINGS AND INFRASTRUCTURE COMPATIBLE WITH THE CHARACTER AND QUALITY OF LIFE IN AND/OR AFFECTING THE OLD TOWN OF AMERSHAM. (C)TO ORGANISE LECTURES FOR THE ENLIGHTENMENT OF MEMBERS AND TO ENCOURAGE GENERAL SUPPORT OF THE SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
AMERSHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.