Dogfen lywodraethu ST CEDD'S SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 4TH MARCH 1971 AND AMENDED 20TH FEBRUARY 1978, 23 NOVEMBER 1983 AND 1ST OCTOBER 2002. AS AMENDED ON 27 JUN 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTIVE OF ST CEDD’S SCHOOL PARENTS’ ASSOCIATION (‘THE ASSOCIATION’) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR EDUCATION, BOTH ACADEMIC AND HOLISTIC, AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY ST CEDD’S SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS
Maes buddion
CHELMSFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.