Dogfen lywodraethu GINGERBREAD CORNER
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 MAY 1979 AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 MARCH 1991 AND 12 NOVEMBER 1992 AND 30 JULY 2008 as amended on 21 Dec 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the Charity are, for the public benefit, to: a) improve the social and economic circumstances of disadvantaged families; b) preserve, protect and improve the good health (mental, emotional and physical) of children and their parents; and c) prevent and relieve the suffering of children who have been the subject of cruelty and maltreatment.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.