Dogfen lywodraethu William Morris College Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/09/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/05/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27/03/2013 as amended on 20 May 2019 as amended on 24 Jul 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity’s objects are, for the public benefit, to relieve sickness, promote good health, provide care to and advance the education and training of: people with a disability (whether mental or physical), the young, the old, or people otherwise in need, particularly (without limitation) by the establishment and maintenance residential houses, day centres, schools, colleges or other types of social and/or educational community,
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.