Dogfen lywodraethu SHLOMO MEMORIAL FUND LIMITED

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 OCT 1978, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 19 FEB 1980 AND 16 SEP 1992 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 9 OCT 1992. NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 6 JUL 2010.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH; AND 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; AND 3) FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS CHARITABLE AND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.