Dogfen lywodraethu THANET CHAMBER CHOIR
Rhif yr elusen: 279032

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 2ND JULY 1979 AS AMENDED 16TH JANUARY 1982 AND 18TH JANUARY 1986, AS AMENDED 14TH OCTOBER 2002 AND 13TH OCTOBER 2003, AS AMENDED ON 13 NOV 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE AIM AND PURPOSE OF THE CHOIR SHALL BE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC WITH A PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON CHORAL CHAMBER MUSIC, TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
THANET
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.