Dogfen lywodraethu THE CLARE ANCIENT HOUSE MUSEUM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 JANUARY 1979, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 27 JANUARY 1997, 22 JULY 1997, 1 JUNE 1998, 15 JANUARY 2001 AND 6 DECEM BER 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM IN CLARE FOR THE PROVISION OF AND EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF SPECIMENS OF ARCHAEOLOGY GEOLOGY AND NATURAL HISTORY OF THE DISTRICT. (B) THE EXTENSION ENHANCEMENT MAINTENANCE AND STORAGE OF THE COLLECTIONS OF THE MUSEUM. (C) THE PROVISION OF A LIBRARY LECTURES AND OTHER FACILITIES OF EDUCATION. (D) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH RELATING TO THE COLLECTIONS OF THE MUSEUM AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS THEREOF.
Maes buddion
CLARE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.