Dogfen lywodraethu THE ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL AND COLLEGE LEADERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 FEBRUARY 1980 AS AFFECTED BY ORDER OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 9 DECEMBER 2002 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 25 JULY 2003 AND 3 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUN 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. THE FUNDS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE APPLIED IN THE MANNER HEREINAFTER PROVIDED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- A) FOR THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR NEED OF MEMBERS, FORMER MEMBERS, EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL AND COLLEGE LEADERS AND THEIR WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, CIVIL PARTNERS, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS. B) FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE “DEPENDANTS” SHALL BE PERSONS AS IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE COMPLETELY OR MAINLY DEPENDENT FOR FINANCIAL SUPPORT ON A PERSON WHO IS OR HAS BEEN A MEMBER OF OR AN EMPLOYEE OR FORMER EMPLOYEE OF THE ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL AND COLLEGE LEADERS OR SHALL HAVE BEEN DEPENDENT UNTIL HE OR SHE CEASED BY DEATH OR OTHERWISE TO BE ABLE TO SUPPORT THEM AND WOULD BE SO DEPENDENT IF HE OR SHE WERE LIVING AND ABLE TO SUPPORT THEM.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.