Dogfen lywodraethu DDRC HEALTHCARE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/08/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/01/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/05/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY: (A) THE CONDUCT OF SCIENTIFIC AND MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO (I) THE EFFECT UPON THE HUMAN BODY OF EXPOSURE TO ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENTS, AND (II) UNDERWATER DIVING SAFETY, AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; (B) THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF MEDICAL CONDITIONS ARISING FROM EXPOSURE TO AN ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENT; (C) THE ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENT TREATMENT OF ILLNESS, DISABILITY OR INJURY; (D) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENT TREATMENT, PROCEDURES AND CARE; AND (E) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE EFFECTS UPON THE HUMAN BODY OF EXPOSURE TO ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENTS. IN THESE OBJECTS 'ALTERED PRESSURE AND/OR GAS ENVIRONMENT' MEANS ANY ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH PRESSURE DIFFERS FROM THAT AT SEA LEVEL, AND/OR THE CONSTITUENT GASES DIFFER IN NATURE FROM THOSE PRESENT IN AIR.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.