Dogfen lywodraethu BASILDON WOMEN'S AID
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1980 AS AMENDED 2 DECEMBER 1986, 28 OCTOBER 2004 AND 13 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 DECEMBER 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO RELIEVE AND WHERE POSSIBLE PREVENT THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR WHO ARE IN FEAR OF SUFFERING PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL AND/OR EMOTIONAL AND/OR FINANCIAL ABUSE AS A RESULT OF THE ACTION OF THEIR PARTNER OR FORMER PARTNER, SPOUSE OR FORMER SPOUSE, COHABITANT OR FORMER COHABITANT, CIVIL PARTNER OR FORMER CIVIL PARTNER OR CHILDREN OR STEPCHILDREN; AND 2) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ISSUES OF DOMESTIC ABUSE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.