Dogfen lywodraethu BRIGHAM YOUNG UNIVERSITY LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 280605

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/05/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/08/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF BRIGHAM YOUNG UNIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.