Dogfen lywodraethu Allied Universal Employees' Trust
Rhif yr elusen: 281616

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DEED OF VARIATION DATED 3RD DECEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 25 APRIL 2006 AND RESOLUTION DATED 16TH NOV 2009. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 FEB 2025 as amended on 12 May 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG AND FOR DESERVING POOR AND NECESSITOUS EMPLOYEES AND DEPENDANTS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.