Dogfen lywodraethu THE COLERIDGE BUS
Rhif yr elusen: 282151

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/07/1978 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/1980 AS AMENDED ON 12/06/1987 AS AMENDED ON 28/07/1989 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/1996 AS AMENDED ON 07/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 22/08/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE ON A NON-PROFIT-MAKING BASIS REGULAR AND SCHEDULED PUBLIC TRANSPORT SERVING RURAL PARISHES EAST OF KINGSBRIDGE AND SOUTH OF DARTMOUTH, AND TO RAISE AND MANAGE FUNDS FOR THIS PURPOSE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
PARISHES EAST OF KINGSBRIDGE AND SOUTH OF DARTMOUTH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.